+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Died On Calendar
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- Tabled Subject To Call
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
- DR - TSDPAA: AP To CN
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- DR - TSDP: CN To AP
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Corrections;Appropriations
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: AC To AP
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Appropriations
+ − Statutes Amended (15)
+ − Vote
March 10, 2020: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor