+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died On Calendar
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2022: Passed As Amended (House)
February 2, 2022: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor