+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Conferees Named Willis,Hood,Horan
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Tindell,Parker,Hopson
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Drug Policy
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A