+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B