+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Died In Committee
- Recommitted to Committee
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 24, 2016: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor