+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- DR - TSDPAA: EN To WM
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Energy;Ways and Means
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: EN To FI
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy;Finance
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
March 5, 2020: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor