+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died In Conference
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Conferees Named Bell (21st),White,Haney
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Horhn,Wiggins,Thompson
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
- DR - TSDPAA: JB To WD
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- DR - TSDPAA: WD To JB
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Workforce Development;Judiciary B
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
- DR - TSDPCS: JB To LA
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDPCS: LA To JB
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor;Judiciary, Division B