+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Passed
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local and Private
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2013: Passed (House)
March 20, 2013: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor