+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A