+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died In Conference
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
- Reconsidered
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Baker, Reynolds)
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 31, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Conferees Named Baker,Bounds,Haney
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Kirby,Burton,Blount
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- DR - TSDP: PH To JA
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Judiciary, Division A
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
April 1, 2013: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 7, 2013: Passed As Amended (House)
February 11, 2013: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor