+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 19, 2020 in the House:
- Died On Calendar
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to Recnsdr Tabled Lost
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Currie, Kinkade, Barnett)
- Passed
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2020: Passed (House)
March 10, 2020: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor