+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Workforce Development
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDPCS: EC To AP
On January 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Economic and Workforce Development;Appropriations
+ − Vote
February 8, 2022: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor