+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Amend From House
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
+ − Votes (4)
March 21, 2017: Concurred in Amend From House (Senate)
March 7, 2017: Passed As Amended (House)
February 13, 2017: Motion to Reconsider Tabled (Senate)
February 9, 2017: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor