+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Business and Financial Institutions
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2013: Passed (House)
February 6, 2013: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor