+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Died On Calendar
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- DR - TSDP: AP To TR
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- DR - TSDP: TR To AP
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation;Appropriations
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Highways and Transportation
+ − Vote
March 4, 2020: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor