+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- DR - TSDPAA: ED To AP
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Education;Appropriations
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
February 12, 2015: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor