+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 27, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 26, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Conferees Named Huddleston,Scoggin,Bounds
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Parks,Williams,Boyd
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2022: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 27, 2022: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 8, 2022: Passed As Amended (House)
February 8, 2022: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor