+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Evans (70th), Turner, Crawford)
- Passed
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To S.C. Accountblty,Efficiency,Transparency
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2014: Passed (House)
February 13, 2014: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor