+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 28, 2015 in the House:
- Conferees Named Weathersby,Mettetal,Sullivan
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Blount,Doty,Burton
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Public Property
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Property
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2015: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 31, 2015: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 9, 2015: Passed As Amended (House)
February 6, 2015: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor