+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Education;Appropriations
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDPCS: ED To AP
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education;Appropriations
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 12, 2019: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor