+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Dixon, Denny, Reynolds)
- Passed
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Apportionment and Elections
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: EL To AC
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2016: Passed (House)
February 25, 2016: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor