+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Conferees Named Gipson,Hood,Monsour
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Polk,Gandy,Fillingane
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: UC To JA
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges;Judiciary, Division A
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2014: Conference Report Adopted (House)
April 1, 2014: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 12, 2014: Passed As Amended (House)
January 31, 2014: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor