+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Passed
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Education
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2016: Passed (House)
February 24, 2016: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor