+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Amend From House
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Amended
- Passed As Amended
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Evans (70th), Turner, Crawford)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To S.C. Accountblty,Efficiency,Transparency
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Passed
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Votes (3)
March 26, 2014: Concurred in Amend From House (Senate)
March 5, 2014: Passed As Amended (House)
February 13, 2014: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor