+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Corrections
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corrections
+ − Statutes Amended (16)
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2014: Passed (House)
February 11, 2014: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor