+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 27, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 26, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Conferees Named Carpenter,Newman,Stamps
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Seymour,DeLano,Turner-Ford
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Military Affairs
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- DR - TSDP: VM To AC
On January 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans and Military Affairs;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency