+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Amend From House
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Military Affairs
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDPCS: VM To AC
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans and Military Affairs;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2018: Concurred in Amend From House (Senate)
February 22, 2018: Passed As Amended (House)
January 31, 2018: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor