+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations