+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Died On Calendar
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- DR - TSDP: JA To PO
- DR - TSDP: PO To JA
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Ports, Harbors and Airports;Judiciary A
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 7, 2013: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor