+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vetoed
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 28, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Conferees Named Cockerham,Lamar,Watson
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Caughman,Sparks,McMahan
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Business and Financial Institutions
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2021: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 29, 2021: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 9, 2021: Passed As Amended (House)
February 11, 2021: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor