+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Died On Calendar
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
- DR - TSDPAA: AP To AC
On June 8, 2020 in the House:
- DR - TSDPAA: AC To AP
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Appropriations
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
March 12, 2020: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor