+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died In Conference
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Conferees Named Zuber,Ford (54th),Busby
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Michel,Hopson,McLendon
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
- DR - TSDPAA: AP To IN
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- DR - TSDPAA: IN To AP
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Insurance;Appropriations
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: IN To AP
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance;Appropriations
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2021: Passed As Amended (House)
February 9, 2021: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor