+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Statutes Amended (13)
+ − Vote
March 9, 2020: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor