+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
February 1, 2018: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor