+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died In Conference
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Conferees Named Horan,Bain,Roberson
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Barnett,Fillingane,Sparks
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Read the Third Time
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- DR - TSDPAA: JB To CN
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- DR - TSDPAA: CN To JB
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Corrections;Judiciary B
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDPCS: CR To JB
On January 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corrections;Judiciary, Division B
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2022: Passed As Amended (House)
February 2, 2022: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor