+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Business and Financial Institutions
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2015: Passed (House)
February 5, 2015: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor