+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Died On Calendar
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Failed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
February 9, 2021: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor