+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Conferees Named Turner,McLeod,Monsour
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Polk,Tollison,Parks
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Amended
- Passed As Amended
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Turner, Foster)
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
- DR - TSDPAA: AC To IN
- DR - TSDPAA: IN To AC
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- DR - TSDPAA: AC To IN
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency,Transparency;Insurance
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (4)
April 20, 2016: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
April 19, 2016: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 28, 2016: Passed As Amended (House)
March 2, 2016: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor