+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died In Conference
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Conferees Named Moore,DeBar,Clarke
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Tollison,Hopson,Polk
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
- DR - TSDPAA: AP To ED
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- DR - TSDPAA: ED To AP
On February 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Education;Appropriations
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: ED To AP
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education;Appropriations