+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Died On Calendar
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- DR - TSDPAA: EN To AG
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- DR - TSDP: AG To EN
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Agriculture;Energy
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDPAA: AG To EN
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture;Energy
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
February 13, 2013: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor