+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 29, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Conferees Named Zuber,Hood,Guice
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Jackson (15th),Harkins,Longwitz
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Banking and Financial Services
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Business and Financial Institutions
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2014: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 31, 2014: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 12, 2014: Passed As Amended (House)
February 12, 2014: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor