+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 5, 2020: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor