+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Conferees Named Martinson,Whittington,Smith (39th)
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Chassaniol,Tindell,Jordan
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
- DR - TSDPAA: WM To TO
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- DR - TSDPAA: TO To WM
On February 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Tourism;Ways and Means
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Tourism
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2014: Conference Report Adopted (House)
April 1, 2014: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 12, 2014: Passed As Amended (House)
February 12, 2014: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor