+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Motion to Recommit Lost
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A