+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Municipalities
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Municipalities
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
February 1, 2017: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor