+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2013: Passed (House)
February 7, 2013: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor