+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Lamar, Cockerham, Bailey)
- Passed
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2019: Passed (House)
February 14, 2019: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor