+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died In Conference
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Conferees Named Bain,Barnett,Horan
On June 19, 2020 in the House:
- Conferees Named Bain,Burnett,Horan
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Wiggins,Branning,Simmons (12th)
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B
+ − Statutes Amended (23)
- 009-0023-0001 -
- 009-0023-0003 -
- 009-0023-0005 -
- 009-0023-0009 -
- 009-0023-0011 -
- 009-0023-0013 -
- 009-0023-0015 -
- 009-0023-0017 -
- 009-0023-0019 -
- 009-0023-0021 -
- 009-0023-0023 -
- 009-0023-0051 -
- 009-0025-0001 -
- 009-0027-0001 -
- 009-0027-0003 -
- 009-0027-0005 -
- 009-0027-0007 -
- 009-0027-0009 -
- 009-0027-0011 -
- 009-0027-0015 -
- 009-0027-0017 -
- 009-0027-0019 -
- 009-0027-0021 -