+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Conferees Named Busby,Massengill,Smith
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named McCaughn,Sparks,Hickman
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDPCS: FO To HI
On January 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Forestry;Highways and Transportation