+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Concurred in Amend From House
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: BF To AC
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Business and Financial Institutions;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
+ − Votes (3)
March 20, 2014: Concurred in Amend From House (Senate)
March 4, 2014: Passed As Amended (House)
February 6, 2014: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor